Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michelle L. Johnson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00286
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #12 Status Report filed by Michelle L. Johnson.Event updated to reflect Motion for status. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 Motion for Status Regarding Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Michelle L. Johnson. (Olinsky, Howard) Modified on 4/22/2021 (ack).
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. (ack)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Notice of Referral. Document filed in error. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Commissioner of Social Security, 6 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. Documents stricken at request of filer. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 STRICKEN NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for final disposition. Judge Staci M. Yandle no longer assigned to the case. (kek) Modified on 4/14/2021 (ack).
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 STRICKEN. NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne) Modified on 4/13/2021 (clt).
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-286-SMY. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (ack)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard D. Olinsky on behalf of Michelle L. Johnson (Olinsky, Howard)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michelle L. Johnson. (Olinsky, Howard)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michelle L. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L. Johnson
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?