Hardimon v. SCF Lewis and Clark Fleeting LLC et al
Plaintiff: Herbert Hardimon
Defendant: SCF Riverport LLC, SEACOR, SCF Shipyards LLC, SCF Lewis and Clark Terminals LLC, SCF Services LLC, SCF Lewis and Clark Fleeting LLC and SCF Fleeting LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00298
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Settergren, Neal)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SCF Lewis and Clark Fleeting LLC.(Settergren, Neal)
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing SCF Lewis and Clark Fleeting LLC to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to SCF Lewis and Clark Fleeting LLC on 4/15/21. Consent due by 5/6/2021 (trb)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob D. Curtis on behalf of SCF Lewis and Clark Fleeting LLC (Curtis, Jacob)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal W Settergren on behalf of SCF Lewis and Clark Fleeting LLC (Settergren, Neal)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Herbert Hardimon. SCF Lewis and Clark Fleeting LLC waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Dripps, Roy)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Dripps, Roy)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Blotevogel on behalf of Herbert Hardimon (Blotevogel, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W. Armbruster, III on behalf of Herbert Hardimon (Armbruster, Charles)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy C. Dripps on behalf of Herbert Hardimon (Dripps, Roy)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Dripps does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Herbert Hardimon. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-298-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 4/7/2021 (lmb)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4430033.), filed by Herbert Hardimon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dripps, Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardimon v. SCF Lewis and Clark Fleeting LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCF Riverport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEACOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCF Shipyards LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCF Lewis and Clark Terminals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCF Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCF Lewis and Clark Fleeting LLC
Represented By: Jacob D. Curtis
Represented By: Neal W Settergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCF Fleeting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Hardimon
Represented By: Roy C. Dripps
Represented By: Michael T. Blotevogel
Represented By: Charles W. Armbruster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?