Liner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cortez Edward Liner
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00327
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cortez Edward Liner. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/13/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Olinsky, Howard)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. At the request of filer, #9 Notice of Appearance filed by Commissioner of Social Security is stricken. Document entered in incorrect case. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 STRICKEN NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Olinksy. (jlrr)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 4/1/2021. (jce)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-327-SPM. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kls3)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard D. Olinsky on behalf of Cortez Edward Liner (Olinsky, Howard)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cortez Edward Liner. (Olinsky, Howard)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Cortez Edward Liner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortez Edward Liner
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?