Eastern Express, Inc. v. Pete Rahn Construction Company
Plaintiff: Eastern Express, Inc.
Defendant: Pete Rahn Construction Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00333
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER, granting #25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by George Ripplinger filed by Eastern Express, Inc. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/21/2021. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by George Ripplinger by Eastern Express, Inc.. (Ripplinger, George)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hurt, Marcia)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court ( Responses due by 5/27/2021), MOTION for Attorney Fees by Eastern Express, Inc.. (Hurt, Marcia)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eastern Express, Inc.. (Hurt, Marcia)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia E. Hurt on behalf of Eastern Express, Inc. (Hurt, Marcia)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marcia E. Hurt on behalf of Plaintiff Eastern Express, Inc. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marcia E. Hurt $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4447653 by on behalf of Eastern Express, Inc.. (Hurt, Marcia)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Pete Rahn Construction Company. (Perryman, Ted)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings With Respect to Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Pete Rahn Construction Company. (Perryman, Ted)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings With Respect to Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint by Pete Rahn Construction Company. Responses due by 5/6/2021 (Perryman, Ted)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Pete Rahn Construction Company. (Perryman, Ted)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Pete Rahn Construction Company. Responses due by 5/6/2021 (Perryman, Ted)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Pete Rahn Construction Company.(Perryman, Ted)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CJRA TRACK B assigned: The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 4/5/2022 at 9:00 AM with a Bench Trial date of 4/18/2022 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 21 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. (tag)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by George R. Ripplinger, Jr on behalf of Eastern Express, Inc. (Ripplinger, George)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-333-JPG. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Ripplinger does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #6 Notice (Other) filed by Eastern Express, Inc. Document correctly filed at Doc. 7. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Ripplinger, George)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STRICKEN. NOTICE by Eastern Express, Inc. Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and Consent/Non-Consent Form (Ripplinger, George) Modified on 4/1/2021 (kls3).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Laquet, Andrew)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Eastern Express, Inc., Pete Rahn Construction Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-333-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 4/16/2021 (kls3)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Laquet on behalf of Pete Rahn Construction Company (Laquet, Andrew)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ted L. Perryman on behalf of Pete Rahn Construction Company (Perryman, Ted)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Randolph County, Illinois, case number 2021-LM-4 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4438446), filed by Pete Rahn Construction Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Supplement Defendant Pete Rahn Construction Company's Disclosure of Corporate Interests Certificate)(Perryman, Ted)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eastern Express, Inc. v. Pete Rahn Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Rahn Construction Company
Represented By: Andrew P. Laquet
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastern Express, Inc.
Represented By: George R. Ripplinger, Jr.
Represented By: Marcia E. Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?