Loquasto v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Anthony Loquasto
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00350
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and returned to attorney Gaines for service. (trb)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/2/2021. (sgp)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION - It has been brought to the attention of the Clerk that the SSAOGC party that was added to this case as an interested party was not the pre-existing party with linked email addresses. The result was that the SSAOGC has not received notice of any documents filed in this case. The proper SSAOGC party has been updated and notices regenerated to the correct party. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-350-SMY. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kek)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Requested. (Gaines, Brent)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent M. Gaines on behalf of Anthony Loquasto (Gaines, Brent)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Loquasto. (Gaines, Brent)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Anthony Loquasto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaines, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loquasto v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Loquasto
Represented By: Brent M. Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?