Adams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Randy Kornell Adams
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00412
Filed: April 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Olinsky (lmb)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, the Court GRANTS (Doc. #2 ) Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall carefully review this Order for information about obtaining service of process by the United States Marshals Service, if desired. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 4/27/2021. (arm)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-412-DWD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (ack)
April 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard D. Olinsky on behalf of Randy Kornell Adams (Olinsky, Howard)
April 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randy Kornell Adams. (Olinsky, Howard)
April 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Randy Kornell Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Kornell Adams
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?