Foreman v. Austin Air Systems, Limited
Plaintiff: Eric Foreman
Defendant: Austin Air Systems, Limited
Case Number: 3:2021cv00460
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Austin Air Systems, Limited. (Carter, Julius)
June 21, 2021 Set Deadlines: Austin Air Systems, Limited answer due 7/2/2021. (kek)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Austin Air Systems, Limited. Answer due 7/2/2021. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/17/2021. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 8, 2021 Filing 14 CJRA TRACK B assigned: The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 6/15/2022 at 9:00 AM with a Bench Trial date of 6/27/2022 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 21 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. (tag)
June 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 21-460-JPG. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 4, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Carter, Julius)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #9 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The Clerks Office received your Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. The form is incomplete. Your signature was absent from the form. Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Please refile completed document. Another form is attached to this notice. Please note that, pursuant to the Courts prior Order, the deadline for submitting this form is June 25, 2021. Further, this is a fillable document. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF.(clt)
June 4, 2021 Consent due by 6/25/2021 (clt)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Austin Air Systems, Limited. (Carter, Julius)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 STRICKEN. CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Carter, Julius) Modified on 6/4/2021 (clt).
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Austin Air Systems, Limited. (Carter, Julius)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Julius C. Carter on behalf of Austin Air Systems, Limited (Carter, Julius)
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Sweet, Benjamin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Foreman. Austin Air Systems, Limited served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (Sweet, Benjamin)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Austin Air Systems, Limited and original mailed to Attorney Sweet. (kdw)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Eric Foreman. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-460-GCS. Consent due by 5/28/2021 (kek)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Sweet on behalf of Eric Foreman (Sweet, Benjamin)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Austin Air Systems, Limited ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4473500.), filed by Eric Foreman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sweet, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foreman v. Austin Air Systems, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Foreman
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Air Systems, Limited
Represented By: Julius C. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?