Laird v. American Commercial Barge Lines, LLC
Plaintiff: David Laird
Defendant: American Commercial Barge Lines, LLC and ACBL Transportation Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00517
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanislav Levchinsky on behalf of ACBL Transportation Services LLC (Levchinsky, Stanislav)
July 22, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACBL Transportation Services LLC. (Fox, Ronald)
July 22, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by ACBL Transportation Services LLC.(Fox, Ronald)
July 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E Fox on behalf of ACBL Transportation Services LLC (Fox, Ronald)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Laird. ACBL Transportation Services LLC waiver sent on 7/13/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (Bloomfield, Lee)
July 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #13 Waiver of Service Executed filed by David Laird. Waiver of Service is actually a duplicate of the one filed at Doc. 8 regarding Defendant American Commercial Barge Line LLC, not ACBL Transportation Services LLC.(kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 STRICKEN. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Laird. ACBL Transportation Services LLC waiver sent on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Bloomfield, Lee) Modified on 7/12/2021 (kls3).
July 7, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ACBL Transportation Services LLC, filed by David Laird.(Bloomfield, Lee)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lee Jeff Bloomfield on behalf of David Laird.. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lee Jeff Bloomfield on behalf of David Laird $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4515956 by on behalf of David Laird. (Bloomfield, Lee)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #8 Waiver of Service Executed filed by David Laird. On 6/24/2021, a waiver of service of summons was filed with an incorrect date of waiver sent. Upon the waiver being re-filed on 6/25/2021, the document filing system did not overwrite the pre-existing (incorrect) answer due date of 8/23/2021. Document text of Document #8 has been modified as follows: American Commercial Barge Lines, LLC waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/06/2021. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Commercial Barge Lines, LLC waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/06/2021. (Henry, Paul) Modified on 6/28/2021 (kek).
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #6 Waiver of Service Executed filed by David Laird. Incorrect date entered as to when waiver was sent. Date should reflect 6/7/21 to trigger correct answer date. Plaintiff to re-file document. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 STRICKEN. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Commercial Barge Lines, LLC waiver sent on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Henry, Paul) Modified on 6/24/2021 (clt).
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Commercial Barge Lines, LLC. Original mailed to Attorney Paul F. Henry for Service. (ack)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Requested. (Henry, Paul)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul F. Henry on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Henry, Paul)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-517-SMY. (ack)
May 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4491154.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Henry, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laird v. American Commercial Barge Lines, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Commercial Barge Lines, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACBL Transportation Services LLC
Represented By: Ronald E Fox
Represented By: Stanislav Levchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Laird
Represented By: Paul F. Henry
Represented By: Lee Jeff Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?