State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al v. Gree USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and Progressive Insurance Company
Defendant: GREE USA, INC., Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. and Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai
Case Number: 3:2021cv00568
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/31/2021 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: call toll free 877-336-1831; when prompted enter Access Code 9139610. The parties are to submit by email (NJRpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov) a Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order seven (7) days prior to the conference call. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 7/16/2021. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2022 at 2:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Jury Trial Month set for November 2022.(drb)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re #6 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(McGuire, Mark)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 DEFENDANTS ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of service)(Litke, Tyler)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Litke on behalf of Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of service)(Litke, Tyler)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L. McGuire on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGuire, Mark)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION - A Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint per this Court's instructions. A Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event "Exhibit" located under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents and should be linked back to the Complaint docket entry when prompted. In addition, see Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Tyler Litke does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-568-NJR. (kek)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial Circuit, Clark County, Illinois, case number 2021L4 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4499990), filed by GREE USA, INC., Gree Electric Appliances, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Summons and complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit Acceptance of service)(Litke, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al v. Gree USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Mark L. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREE USA, INC.
Represented By: Tyler Litke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree Electric Appliances, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler Litke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai
Represented By: Tyler Litke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?