McDuffey v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Christine Marie McDuffey
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00776
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wyatt, Nathan)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of All Defendants (Wyatt, Nathan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, and returned to Attorney Olinsky for service. (kls3)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting (Doc. #2 ). For the reasons stated in the attached Order, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall carefully review this Order for information about obtaining service of process by the United States Marshals Service, if desired. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 7/8/2021. (arm)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-00776-DWD. (clt)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard D. Olinsky on behalf of Christine Marie McDuffey (Olinsky, Howard)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christine Marie McDuffey. (Olinsky, Howard)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Christine Marie McDuffey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDuffey v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Marie McDuffey
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?