Shelton v. Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Plaintiff: Emma Shelton
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00799
Filed: July 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Rule 41(a)(1)(A) permits dismissal without a court order by two methods: (i) the plaintiff files a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment; or (ii) the plaintiff files a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared. In the instant case, the plaintiff has filed a notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice before the defendant has appeared in this action. Given the procedural posture of the case, the Court need take no further action. The stipulation effected the dismissal of this suit, with prejudice. See National Inspection & Repairs, Inc. v. George S. May Intern. Co., 600 F.3d 878, 883 (7th Cir. 2010) ("Claims dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) are complete on the dismissal without any action by the district judge."); Szabo Food Service, Inc. v. Canteen Corp., 823 F.2d 1073, 1078 (7th Cir. 1987)(a Rule 41(a)(1)(i) dismissal terminates the case "all by itself"), cert. denied, 485 U.S. 901 (1988). The Clerk of Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 8/30/2021. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emma Shelton (Sheehan, Spencer)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David W. Dugan for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/13/2021. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kraft Heinz Foods Company. Original mailed to counsel for service. (amv)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer I. Sheehan on behalf of Emma Shelton (Sheehan, Spencer)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION: See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Spencer Sheehan does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-799-JPG. (amv)
July 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kraft Heinz Foods Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4523316.), filed by Emma Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons)(Sheehan, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Shelton
Represented By: Spencer I. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?