City of Metropolis, Illinois et al v. Honeywell International, Inc.
Plaintiff: City of Metropolis, Illinois and County of Massac
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00860
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Metropolis, Illinois, County of Massac. Honeywell International, Inc. waiver sent on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Lange, Nicholas)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney David R. Barney, Jr. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David R. Barney, Jr $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4555594 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Barney, David)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R. Lange on behalf of City of Metropolis, Illinois, County of Massac (Lange, Nicholas)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katrina Carroll on behalf of City of Metropolis, Illinois, County of Massac (Carroll, Katrina)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-860-SMY. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kek)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Clayborne, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Clayborne, James)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Honeywell International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4536043.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Clayborne, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Metropolis, Illinois et al v. Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Metropolis, Illinois
Represented By: James F. Clayborne, Jr.
Represented By: David R. Barney, Jr.
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Nicholas R. Lange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Massac
Represented By: James F. Clayborne, Jr.
Represented By: David R. Barney, Jr.
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Nicholas R. Lange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?