Allen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Allen, Sr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00861
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and original mailed to Plaintiff. (kek)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. For the reasons discussed in the attached Memorandum & Order, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #6 Motion for Service of Process at Government Expense and DENIES #5 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 8/24/2021. (sth)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #7 Memorandum and Order. A corrected Order will be entered. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STRICKEN - ORDER. For the reasons discussed in the attached Memorandum & Order, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #6 Motion for Service of Process at Government Expense and DENIES #5 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 8/23/2021. (sth) Modified on 8/24/2021 (kek).
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense by Kevin D. Allen, Sr. (kdw)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Kevin D. Allen, Sr. (kdw)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin D. Allen, Sr. (kdw)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 Sealed Personal ID Page. (kdw)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Kevin D. Allen, Sr.(kdw)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-861-DWD Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (kdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Allen, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?