USA v. Welch et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Martha J. Welch, Castle Credit Corporation and City of Marion, Illinois
Case Number: 3:2021cv00886
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Martha J. Welch served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Hanna, Adam)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Martha J. Welch. Original summons and service packet sent to USMS. (lmb)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Castle Credit Corporation waiver sent on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Hanna, Adam)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. City of Marion, Illinois waiver sent on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Hanna, Adam)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-886-SMY. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (tba)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of USA (Hanna, Adam)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE by USA (Hanna, Adam)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Castle Credit Corporation, City of Marion, Illinois, Martha J. Welch, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Welch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha J. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Marion, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?