Scott v. Continental Express Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott and Gregory A. Scott
Defendant: Continental Express Inc. and Richard Atkins
Case Number: 3:2021cv00904
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is SET for 10/27/2021 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610. The parties shall submit a Joint Report of the Parties 7 days prior to the conference call by email to NJRpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov.. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/21/2021. (drb)
September 21, 2021 Filing 16 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2022 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Bench Trial Month set for October 2022. (drb)
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Richard Atkins.(McCann, Robert)
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory A. Scott. Richard Atkins served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Wendler, Brian)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. McCann on behalf of Richard Atkins (McCann, Robert)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #11 Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures Designations and Objections filed by Continental Express Inc. Initial disclosures or discovery under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) should be filed with the Clerk of Court upon Order of the Courtor if a dispute arises over the disclosure or discovery. See Local Rule 26.1 page 13. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 STRICKEN RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections byContinental Express Inc.. (McCann, Robert)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Amended) from St. Clair County, Illinois Circuit Court, case number 21 L 0567, filed by Continental Express Inc..(McCann, Robert)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTION: Defendant removed asserting that this court has subject matter jurisdiction based on diversity of citizenship. The amount in controversy must exceed "$75,000, exclusive of interest and costs" for the Court to have diversity jurisdiction over the case. 28 U.S.C. 1332 (emphasis added). Here, the Notice of Removal alleges that the amount in controversy "exceeds $75,000.00 exclusive of fees and costs." (Doc. 1, p. 2) (emphasis added). Accordingly, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, Defendant is ORDERED to file an Amended Notice of Removal on or before August 31, 2021 to properly set forth the basis for this Court's jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/24/2021. (drr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. McCann on behalf of Continental Express Inc. (McCann, Robert)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ACTION: See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney McCann does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 24, 2021 Set Deadlines: Action due by 8/31/2021. (amv)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Continental Express Inc..(McCann, Robert)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Wendler on behalf of Gregory A. Scott (Wendler, Brian)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-904-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (amv)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Express Inc.. (McCann, Robert)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT by Continental Express Inc.. - Civil Cover Sheet. (McCann, Robert)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, Illinois Circuit Court, case number 21 L 0567 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4546358), filed by Continental Express Inc..(McCann, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Continental Express Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory A. Scott
Represented By: Brian M. Wendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Express Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Atkins
Represented By: Robert M. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?