Beckwith v. Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: KALEN D BECKWITH and Kalen D. Beckwith
Defendant: GREENWOOD MOTOR LINES, INC. D/B/A R&L CARRIERS, JUSTIN MAYNARD and Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. doing business as R&L Carriers
Case Number: 3:2021cv01027
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Continue. Due to a conflict in the Defendant Counsels schedule, the telephonic scheduling conference set for November 4, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. is RESET for November 4, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. Instructions for joining the conference call remains as follows: (1) call toll-free, 1-877-336-1829; (2) when prompted, enter the Access Code: 4442281; (3) followed by the Security Code: 1027. This is a time change only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 10/6/2021. (jmj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 5, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.. (Coleman, Christi)
September 30, 2021 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent R&L Carriers, Inc. for Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.. (White, Anthony)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 1-877-336-1829; (2) when prompted, enter the Access Code: 4442281; (3) followed by the Security Code: 1027. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/30/2021. (jmj)
September 30, 2021 Filing 25 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Presumptive Jury Trial month set for September 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/30/2021. (jmj)
September 22, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc..(White, Anthony)
September 22, 2021 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., filed by Kalen D. Beckwith.(Fluhr, Steven)
September 21, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-01027-MAB. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 20, 2021 Filing 21 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Coleman, Christi) Modified on 9/21/2021 (clt).
September 15, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE: Justin Maynard was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Justin Maynard shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 9/22/2021 (lmb)
September 15, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #18 Notice (Other) filed by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. Incorrect event selected. Select the event that most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Consent/Non-consent to US Magistrate Judge" under the heading "Other Filings/ Other Documents". Docket text modified to reflect the correct document. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 14, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Coleman, Christi) Modified docket text and security on 9/15/2021 (lmb).
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #16 Notice (Other) filed by Kalen D. Beckwith. Incorrect event selected. Select the event that most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Consent/Non-consent to US Magistrate Judge" under the heading "Other Filings/ Other Documents ". Docket text modified to reflect the correct document. No further action required by the filer No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 10, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties (Fluhr, Steven) Modified on 9/13/2021 (kdw).
September 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE: Plaintiff Beckwith was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Plaintiff Beckwith shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 9/17/2021 (amv)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #11 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff filed a motion seeking to voluntarily dismiss Defendant Justin Maynard without prejudice (Doc. 11). Given that the case is still in the pleadings stage, the Court believes it is more appropriate for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint that eliminates Maynard as a Defendant. See Taylor v. Brown, 787 F.3d 851, 857 (7th Cir. 2015) (Rule 41(a) can only be used to dismiss an entire case; an amended complaint under Rule 15(a) is the proper vehicle to drop an individual defendant or claim). Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby GRANTED leave under Rule 15(a)(2) to file an amended complaint on or before September 10, 2021. Justin Maynard will remain a Defendant unless and until Plaintiff files an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/27/2021. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 27, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., Justin Maynard re 12 Order, #1 Notice of Removal of Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(White, Anthony)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Defendants neglected to attach the state court complaint and summons (Exhibits 1 and 2) to the Notice of Removal (see Doc. 1). Accordingly, Defendants shall file an Amended Notice of Removal that includes the exhibits on or before September 2, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/27/2021. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Justin Maynard by Kalen D. Beckwith. Responses due by 9/30/2021 (Fluhr, Steven)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Fluhr on behalf of Plaintiff Kalen Beckwith. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven S. Fluhr $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4563205 by on behalf of Kalen D. Beckwith. (Fluhr, Steven)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney White on behalf of Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. and Justin Maynard. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony C. White $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4563005 by on behalf of Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., Justin Maynard. (White, Anthony)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 Justin Maynard's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Justin Maynard.(Coleman, Christi)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc..(Coleman, Christi)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 Letter to Attorney Steven S. Fluhr regarding admission to SDIL. (tba)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-1027-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 9/9/2021 (tba)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christi L. Coleman on behalf of All Defendants (Coleman, Christi)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Clair County, case number 21L0671 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4554196), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Coleman, Christi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckwith v. Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KALEN D BECKWITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalen D. Beckwith
Represented By: Steven S. Fluhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENWOOD MOTOR LINES, INC. D/B/A R&L CARRIERS
Represented By: Christi L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN MAYNARD
Represented By: Christi L. Coleman
Represented By: Anthony C. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. doing business as R&L Carriers
Represented By: Anthony C. White
Represented By: Christi L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?