McGhee v. Commissioner of Social Security
Defendant: Ronnie McGhee, Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01089
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronnie McGhee. (Womick, John)
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronnie McGhee. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/20/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (Womick, John)
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Summons Returned Executed filed by Ronnie McGhee. Filer used the incorrect event. Filer needs to re-file the document using the event "Summons Returned Executed as to USA". (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Beyer Payne on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Payne, Lindsay)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 STRICKEN SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronnie McGhee. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Womick, John) Modified on 9/29/2021 (tba).
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wyatt, Nathan)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wyatt, Nathan)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney John Womick. (tba)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Womick on behalf of Ronnie McGhee (Womick, John)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by Ronnie McGhee.See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Womick does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-1089-SMY. (tba)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4572997.), filed by Ronnie McGhee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Womick, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGhee v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie McGhee
Represented By: John P. Womick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lindsay Beyer Payne
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?