Blattner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael Paul Blattner
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01123
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Beyer Payne on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Payne, Lindsay)
October 15, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wyatt, Nathan)
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wyatt, Nathan)
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge, #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Commissioner of Social Security at the request of filer. Filer will refile the documents. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 STRICKEN CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 STRICKEN NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, and returned to Attorney Olinsky for service. (kls3)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting (Doc. #2 ). For the reasons stated in the attached Order, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall carefully review this Order for information about obtaining service of process by the United States Marshals Service, if desired. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 9/13/2021. (arm)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-1123-DWD. (kls3)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard D. Olinsky on behalf of Michael Paul Blattner (Olinsky, Howard)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Paul Blattner. (Olinsky, Howard)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michael Paul Blattner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blattner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Paul Blattner
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lindsay Beyer Payne
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?