Bryant v. Pate et al
Plaintiff: Joey R. Bryant
Defendant: Gregory A. Pate and Tru Vision Express
Case Number: 3:2021cv01225
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ACTION re #9 Answer to Complaint filed by Tru Vision Express, #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Tru Vision Express. Counsel is not generally admitted to practice in this Court. Counsel must file a Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission or seek general admission. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tru Vision Express.(Magnani, Peter)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Magnani on behalf of Tru Vision Express (Magnani, Peter)
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joey R. Bryant. Gregory A. Pate served on 10/17/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Rademacher, Paul)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joey R. Bryant. Tru Vision Express served on 10/17/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Rademacher, Paul)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gregory A. Pate, Tru Vision Express. Originals mailed to requesting party. (clt)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E.H. Rademacher on behalf of Joey R. Bryant (Rademacher, Paul)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-01225-SPM. (clt)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested. (Rademacher, Paul)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by Joey R. Bryant against All Defendants, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4601383) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rademacher, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Pate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey R. Bryant
Represented By: Paul E.H. Rademacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A. Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tru Vision Express
Represented By: Peter J. Magnani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?