Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dottie M. Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01739
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Defendant's brief due within 30 days after filing of plaintiff's brief. Plaintiff brief due by 3/13/2022. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 2/11/2022. (tba)
February 10, 2022 Filing 10 SUBMISSION OF TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record. filed by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13, #13 Part 14, #14 Part 15, #15 Part 16, #16 Part 17, #17 Part 18, #18 Part 19, #19 Part 20, #20 Part 21, #21 Part 22)(Wyatt, Nathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Wyatt, Nathan)
January 13, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE - All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Nonetheless, to maintain an equalized docket and to foster efficiency, this action will not be referred to a magistrate judge at this time. See Administrative Order No. 293. Accordingly, until further notice, this case will remain with the assigned district judge. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wyatt, Nathan) Modified on 1/13/2022 (clt).
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wyatt, Nathan)
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Camp, David)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original returned to Attorney Camp for service. (kls3)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-1739-DWD. (kls3)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Camp on behalf of Dottie M. Smith (Camp, David)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4664151.), filed by Dottie M. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Camp, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dottie M. Smith
Represented By: David D. Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?