Labrenz v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987
Plaintiff: Mr Trent Labrenz
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987, Dennis Jones dba Eagle Window & Siding, Eagle Window & Siding, Jacob M. Sitze, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987, Dennis Jones d/b/a Eagle Window & Siding and Eagle Windows & Siding, Inc. d/b/a Eagle Home Improvement
Counter Defendant: Trent Labrenz
Case Number: 3:2021cv01793
Filed: December 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response in Opposition to Realign & Response in Opposition to Consolidate, #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rohrer, Adrian)
February 7, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Donohoo on behalf of Dennis Jones (Donohoo, Christopher)
January 31, 2022 Per Order at Doc. 19, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Remand and #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Responses due by 2/28/2022. (kls3)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Defendant Certain Underwriters shall file a combined response to the motions to remand filed by Plaintiff Labrenz (Doc. #9 ) and Defendant Jacob Sitze (Doc. #17 ) on or before February 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/31/2022. (rts)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 28, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jacob M. Sitze. (Phillips, Erin)
January 28, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jacob M. Sitze. (Phillips, Erin)
January 28, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley C. Young on behalf of Jacob M. Sitze (Young, Bradley)
January 28, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M. Phillips on behalf of Jacob M. Sitze (Phillips, Erin)
January 21, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re #5 by Eagle Windows & Siding, Inc., Dennis Jones. (Unsell, Edward)
January 21, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W. Unsell on behalf of Eagle Windows & Siding, Inc., Dennis Jones (Unsell, Edward)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/20/2022. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Gregory King on behalf of Trent Labrenz (King, Patrick)
January 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ACTION re #9 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Trent Labrenz.See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney King does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case.(kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response in Opposition to Realign & Response in Opposition to Consolidate by Trent Labrenz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FS Complaint for Declaratory Judgment in State Court, #2 Exhibit Email re Waiver of Service to Sitze, #3 Exhibit Executed Waiver of Service to Lloyd's of London, #4 Exhibit FS Affidavit of Service on Eagle, #5 Exhibit FS Affidavit of Service on Dennis Jones, #6 Exhibit FS Defendants' Labrenz Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(King, Patrick)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-1793-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kls3)
December 31, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrian Thomas Rohrer on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987 (Rohrer, Adrian)
December 31, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987 identifying Corporate Parent Brit UW Ltd., Corporate Parent Brit Ltd., Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent Ontario Municipal Employees Retirement System for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987. (Rohrer, Adrian)
December 31, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Trent Labrenz, Dennis Jones dba Eagle Window & Siding, Eagle Window & Siding, Jacob M. Sitze by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rohrer, Adrian)
December 31, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 3:21-cv-01793 and 3:21-cv-01217 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987. (Rohrer, Adrian)
December 31, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Order toRealign Parties filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rohrer, Adrian)
December 31, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Order toRealign Parties by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987. (Rohrer, Adrian)
December 31, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the Third Judicial Circuit, Madison County, Illinois, case number 2021 MR 001196, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rohrer, Adrian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labrenz v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Trent Labrenz
Represented By: Patrick Gregory King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Trent Labrenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987
Represented By: Adrian Thomas Rohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Jones dba Eagle Window & Siding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Window & Siding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob M. Sitze
Represented By: Erin M. Phillips
Represented By: Jane Unsell
Represented By: Bradley C. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. BRT3A002360-02, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987
Represented By: Adrian Thomas Rohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Jones d/b/a Eagle Window & Siding
Represented By: Edward W. Unsell
Represented By: Christopher M. Donohoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Windows & Siding, Inc. d/b/a Eagle Home Improvement
Represented By: Edward W. Unsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?