Deli Star Corporation v. Continental Western Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Deli Star Corporation
Defendant: Continental Western Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00557
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana A Rice on behalf of Continental Western Insurance Company (Rice, Dana)
April 26, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek J. Siegel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Siegel, Derek)
April 26, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ACTION: See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Siegel does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case.(kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 25, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Count I and the Entirety of Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Bldg Permit)(Siegel, Derek)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 5/2/2023 at 9:00 AM with a Bench Trial date of 5/22/2023 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Discovery due by 12/22/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/20/2023. Stipulation Selecting Mediator to be filed by 5/18/2022. Mandatory Mediation Session to be completed by 11/22/2022. Mandatory Mediation Program Completion due by 1/6/2023. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report)(tag)
April 25, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 10 Order. Order entered in error. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STRICKEN SHOW CAUSE ORDER. The parties have failed to submit their joint report by the required date. The parties are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within 7 days as to why this Court should not dismiss this case for failure to prosecute. The parties may also provide the Joint Report to the Court within 7 days in lieu of a response to the show cause. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 5/2/2022. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/25/2022. (tag)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 4/25/2022 (kdw).
March 25, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint [and Affirmative Defenses] by Continental Western Insurance Company.(Eastham, James)
March 25, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Count I and the Entirety of Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Eastham, James)
March 25, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Count I and the Entirety of Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Eastham, James)
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 CJRA TRACK B assigned: The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 5/2/2023 at 9:00 AM with a Bench Trial date of 5/22/2023 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 28 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 4/20/2022. (tag)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MANDATORY MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/23/2022. (tag)
March 21, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:22-cv-557-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (adh)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Western Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent W. R. Berkley Corporation for Continental Western Insurance Company. (Eastham, James)
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James M Eastham on behalf of Continental Western Insurance Company (Eastham, James)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County Circuit Court, case number 21 L 1247 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4736465), filed by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Eastham, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deli Star Corporation v. Continental Western Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deli Star Corporation
Represented By: Derek J. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Western Insurance Company
Represented By: James M Eastham
Represented By: Dana A Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?