Alvarez-Carvajal v. USA
Petitioner: Fernando Alvarez-Carvajal
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2022cv00743
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Expand the Record filed by Petitioner Fernando Alvarez-Carvajal. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/28/2022. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 27, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Expand the Record filed by USA. (Scott, Angela)
April 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Scott on behalf of USA (Scott, Angela)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Government is ORDERED to respond to #3 Motion to Expand the Record filed by Fernando Alvarez-Carvajal on or before May 9, 2022. (Responses due by 5/9/2022). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/25/2022. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Expand the Record by Fernando Alvarez-Carvajal. (jaj)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Timely Filing by Fernando Alvarez-Carvajal (jaj)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Fernando Alvarez-Carvajal. (Attachments: #1 Letter to AUSA)(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez-Carvajal v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fernando Alvarez-Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Represented By: Angela Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?