Walker v. USA
Petitioner: Randall Lee Walker
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2022cv00986
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court ORDERS Walker to SHOW CAUSE on or before July 15, 2022, why the Court should not dismiss his 2255 motion as untimely under 2255(f). The Court DENIES without prejudice Walker's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 2), DENIES as moot Walker's motion for service by publication (Doc. 3) and DENIES without prejudice Walker's motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. 4). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/17/2022. (jdh)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to resend the Court's May 27, 2022, #6 order to Walker at FTC Oklahoma City, FEDERAL TRANSFER CENTER, P.O. BOX 898801, OKLAHOMA CITY, OK 73189. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/31/2022. (tlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Doc 1-1 sent to Randall Lee Walker at Coleman II, USP was returned. (kls3)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, The Court DISMISSES without prejudice Walker's 2255 motion in Case No. 22-cv-987-JPG and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close that case. Walker's 2255 motion in Case No. 22-cv-986-JPG is construed as a motion to vacate, set aside or correct his sentence in Case No. 18-cr-40087-JPG. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/27/2022. (jdh)
May 12, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey E. A. Bloodworth on behalf of USA (Bloodworth, Casey)
May 11, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Randall Lee Walker. (kare)
May 11, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Service by Publication by Randall Lee Walker. (kare)
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randall Lee Walker. (kare)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Randall Lee Walker. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(kare)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randall Lee Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Amanda A. Robertson
Represented By: Casey E. A. Bloodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?