USA v. Masterpiece Arms, Model MPA30T, 9mm caliber pistol, bearing serial number FX25266 and12 rounds of ammunition
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Masterpiece Arms, Model MPA30T, 9mm caliber pistol, bearing serial number FX25266 and12 rounds of ammunition
Claimant: Kyle Macovery
Case Number: 3:2022cv01243
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1341 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STAYING CASE: The Government's Motion to Stay (Doc. #8 ) is GRANTED. A Status Report is due on January 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/27/2022. (cka) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 27, 2022 Per Order at Doc. 10: Status Report due by 1/27/2023. (kls3)
July 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #7 Claim filed by Masterpiece Arms, Model MPA30T, 9mm caliber pistol, bearing serial number FX25266 and12 rounds of ammunition, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Masterpiece Arms, Model MPA30T, 9mm caliber pistol, bearing serial number FX25266 and12 rounds of ammunition. Text entries modified to reflect the proper filing party as Claimant Kyle Macovery and not "All Defendants." Docket corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 22, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture by USA. (Hanna, Adam)
July 22, 2022 Filing 7 CLAIM by Claimant Kyle Macovery (Mack, Gary). Modified on 7/25/2022 (kls3).
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary A. Mack on behalf of Claimant Kyle Macovery (Mack, Gary) Modified on 7/25/2022 (kls3).
June 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by USA (Amended Direct Notice of Civil Judicial Forfeiture) (Hanna, Adam)
June 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by USA (Direct Notice of Civil Judicial Forfeiture) (Hanna, Adam)
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 22-1243-SMY. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kdw)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of USA (Hanna, Adam)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against Masterpiece Arms, Model MPA30T, 9mm caliber pistol, bearing serial number FX25266 and12 rounds of ammunition, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Masterpiece Arms, Model MPA30T, 9mm caliber pistol, bearing serial number FX25266 and12 rounds of ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masterpiece Arms, Model MPA30T, 9mm caliber pistol, bearing serial number FX25266 and12 rounds of ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kyle Macovery
Represented By: Gary A. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?