Williams v. JRN, Inc.
Plaintiff: D'Lisa Williams
Defendant: JRN, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01253
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STAYING CASE: Defendant JRN, Inc., has moved to dismiss the Complaint filed by Plaintiff D'Lisa Williams on statute of limitations grounds. (Doc. #12 ). JRN alternatively asks the Court to stay this case pending decisions in two cases before the Illinois Supreme Court that will directly affect the outcome in this matter. The Court agrees, in the interest of judicial economy and the parties' resources, that this case should be stayed until the Illinois Supreme Court issues its decisions in Tims v. Black Horse Motor Carriers, Inc. and Cothron v. White Castle Systems, Inc. Defendant is ORDERED to provide this Court with a status report within 14 days of each opinion being issued. The Court will provide a briefing schedule on the motion to dismiss, if necessary, at that time. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/1/2022. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 29, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JRN, Inc.. (Northrip, William)
July 29, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JRN, Inc.. (Northrip, William)
July 29, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Francis Northrip on behalf of JRN, Inc. (Northrip, William)
July 15, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against JRN, Inc., filed by D'Lisa Williams.(Peluso, Patrick)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JURISDICTIONAL ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte on the issue of federal subject matter jurisdiction. See Foster v. Hill, 497 F.3d 695, 696-97 (7th Cir. 2007) ("It is the responsibility of a court to make an independent evaluation of whether subject matter jurisdiction exists in every case."). Plaintiff D'Lisa Williams filed this case pursuant to the Class Action Fairness Act ("CAFA"), which requires minimal diversity among the parties. This means that one member of the plaintiff class must be a citizen of a state different from any one defendant. Here, Williams alleges to be a resident of Illinois, but "residence and citizenship are not synonyms and it is the latter that matters for purposes of diversity jurisdiction." Meyerson v. Harrah's E. Chicago Casino, 299 F.3d 616, 617 (7th Cir. 2002). The citizenship of a natural person for diversity purposes is determined by the person's domicile, which means the state where the person is physically present with an intent to remain there indefinitely. See Pollution Control Indus. of Am., Inc. v. Van Gundy, 21 F.3d 152, 155 n.4 (7th Cir. 1994). Williams also alleges Defendant JRN, Inc., is a Tennessee corporation, but she does not allege the location of JRN's principal place of business. See 28 U.S.C. 1332 (a corporation shall be deemed to be a citizen of every State in which it has been incorporated and of the State where it has its principal place of business). Thus, the Court requires more information to determine whether minimal diversity is satisfied. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint, on or before July 15, 2022, which clearly sets forth all of the information needed to confirm that diversity jurisdiction under CAFA is satisfied. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this action may be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2022.) Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/15/2022. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 22-cv-1253-NJR. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 14, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to JRN, Inc. and original mailed to Attorney Peluso. (kek)
June 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Woodrow on behalf of D'Lisa Williams (Woodrow, Steven)
June 14, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Peluso, Patrick)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick H. Peluso on behalf of D'Lisa Williams (Peluso, Patrick)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Patrick Peluso does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: D'Lisa Williams. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 22-cv-1253-GCS. Consent due by 7/5/2022 (kek)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JRN, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4807957.), filed by D'Lisa Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Peluso, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. JRN, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Lisa Williams
Represented By: Patrick H. Peluso
Represented By: Steven L. Woodrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRN, Inc.
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?