McCarty v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sarah McCarty
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01852
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE - All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Nonetheless, to maintain an equalized docket and to foster efficiency, this action will not be referred to a magistrate judge at this time. See Administrative Order No. 293. Accordingly, until further notice, this case will remain with the assigned district judge. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 16, 2022 Filing 10 FINAL CONSENT TO TRIAL BY U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Wyatt, Nathan) Modified/unsealed on 9/19/2022 (lmb).
September 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wyatt, Nathan)
September 2, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and original mailed to Attorney Gaines. (kdw)
August 31, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Gaines, Brent)
August 31, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Gaines, Brent)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #3 ). Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 8/16/2022. (jnh)
August 15, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 22-1852-DWD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (lmb)
August 12, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sarah McCarty. (Gaines, Brent)
August 12, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent M. Gaines on behalf of Sarah McCarty (Gaines, Brent)
August 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Sarah McCarty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaines, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarty v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah McCarty
Represented By: Brent M. Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?