Weaver v. Stobbs, II
Defendant: Jermaine Weaver and John D Stobbs, II
Case Number: 3:2022cv02130
Filed: September 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/7/2022. (jdh)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court DENIES Weaver's motion for leave to amend his complaint (Doc. 11), DENIES as moot Weaver's motion to appoint counsel, who would not have had a reasonable chance of changing the result of this case (Doc. 10), DISMISSES Weaver's case without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/7/2022. (jdh)
November 3, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend Complaint. (adh)
November 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #7 Amended Complaint and #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Jermaine Weaver. Prematurely filed. (adh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 2, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (adh)
November 2, 2022 Filing 8 STRICKEN MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jermaine Weaver. (adh) Modified on 11/4/2022 (kek).
November 2, 2022 Filing 7 STRICKEN AMENDED COMPLAINT against John D Stobbs, II, filed by Jermaine Weaver.(adh)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/10/2022. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/12/2022. (jdh)
October 11, 2022 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 593. (adh)
September 29, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kare)
September 13, 2022 Filing 4 Letter to Plaintiff Jermaine Weaver as to filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) (adh)
September 13, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against John D Stobbs, II, filed by Jermaine Weaver.(adh)
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Jermaine Weaver to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Jermaine Weaver on 9/13/22. Consent due by 10/4/2022 (adh)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:22-cv-02130-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (adh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Stobbs, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermaine Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Stobbs, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?