St. Clair Country Club v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: St. Clair Country Club
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv03012
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2023 Filing 17 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2024 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2024 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. (jlm)
February 2, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 22-3012-RJD. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 1, 2023 Filing 15 FINAL CONSENT TO TRIAL BY U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Melton, Isaac) Modified/unsealed on 2/2/2023 (lmb).
February 1, 2023 Filing 14 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Beasley, Jarrod)
January 30, 2023 Filing 13 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Melton, Isaac)
January 24, 2023 Filing 12 Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Melton, Isaac)
January 12, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Beasley, Jarrod)
January 12, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing St. Clair Country Club and Cincinnati Insurance Company to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to St. Clair Country Club and Cincinnati Insurance Company on 1/12/2023. Consent due by 2/2/2023 (mar)
January 3, 2023 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Melton, Isaac)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by 1/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 12/28/2022. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/28/2022. (mlp)
December 27, 2022 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Melton, Isaac)
December 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Ramiah Melton on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company (Melton, Isaac)
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 22-3012-NJR. (lmb)
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James Philip DuChateau on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company (DuChateau, James)
December 21, 2022 Filing 2 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for Cincinnati Insurance Company. (DuChateau, James)
December 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 2022LA0983 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4958055), filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit 02, #3 Exhibit 03, #4 Exhibit 04, #5 Exhibit 05, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(DuChateau, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Clair Country Club v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Clair Country Club
Represented By: Jarrod P. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: James Philip DuChateau
Represented By: James P. DuChateau
Represented By: Isaac Ramiah Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?