Hines v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Amy Hines
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2022cv03152
Filed: December 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to counsel for service. (adh)
January 24, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 1977 (clw)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. A court may permit a plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis, without the prepayment of fees, where the plaintiff has demonstrated indigence and an inability to pay such fees. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). The Court does not find that Plaintiff's affidavit demonstrates indigence. While Plaintiff indicates that she does not have a personal source of income, many courts have considered spousal income and assets in the determination of indigence under 28 U.S.C. 1915. See Lee v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., 1993 WL 316756, *3 (N.D. Ind. Aug. 18, 1993) (listing cases considering spousal and family income and assets to determine indigence). According to the financial information provided in Plaintiff's motion and affidavit, including the monthly net income of Plaintiff's spouse, the Court does not find that Plaintiff qualifies as indigent, even though Plaintiff lists high expenses in comparison to that income. Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/11/2023. (kss) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 6, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wyatt, Nathan)
January 6, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wyatt, Nathan)
January 4, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #5 Summons Issued as to USA. Summons issued in error. (adh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 4, 2023 Filing 5 STRICKEN Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to counsel for service. (adh)
January 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #1 Complaint filed by Amy Hines. Consent to Magistrate Judge was filed incorrectly as an attachment to Complaint. Document should have been filed separately using the event Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge which would have placed the document under seal. Consent has been deleted and Docket text has been modified accordingly. (csb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 31, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Commencement of Action and Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. An electronic copy of the Complaint is attached. All future documents must bear case number 22-3152-NJR. (csb) (csb).
December 31, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amy Hines. (Linerud, Rory)
December 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Amy Hines. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, # 3 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(Linerud, Rory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Hines
Represented By: Rory Linerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?