Days Inns Worldwide, Inc., v. Umiya Mataji Investment, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC., and Days Inns Worldwide, Inc.
Defendant: UMIYA MATAJI INVESTMENT, INC.,, JAYANTI PATEL, JAIMINI PATEL, VIPOOL PATEL, PAYAL PATEL and Umiya Mataji Investment, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00235
Filed: January 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Days Inns Worldwide, Inc.. Jaimini Patel served on 3/6/2023, answer due 3/27/2023. (Couch, Bryan)
February 24, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #12 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Days Inns Worldwide, Inc.. Filer used incorrect date of service. Service updated to reflect 2/20/2023, for all three parties served. Answer due date updated to 3/13/2023. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 24, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Days Inns Worldwide, Inc.. Jayanti Patel served on 2/20/2023, answer due 3/13/2023; Vipool Patel served on 2/20/2023, answer due 3/13/2023; Umiya Mataji Investment, Inc. served on 2/20/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Couch, Bryan) Modified on 2/24/2023 (jaj).
February 21, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Days Inns Worldwide, Inc.. Payal Patel served on 2/16/2023, answer due 3/9/2023. (Konkel, Brian)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Donaldson on behalf of Days Inns Worldwide, Inc.(aza)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Couch on behalf of Days Inns Worldwide, Inc. (aza)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 16, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Yvette Donaldson $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-5003137 by on behalf of Days Inns Worldwide, Inc.. (Donaldson, Yvette)
February 16, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan Paul Couch $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-5003090 by on behalf of Days Inns Worldwide, Inc.. (Couch, Bryan)
January 27, 2023 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Jaimini Patel, Jayanti Patel, Payal Patel, Vipool Patel, Umiya Mataji Investment, Inc., and originals mailed to Attorney Konkel. (kdw)
January 26, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jayanti Patel, #2 Summons Payal Patel, #3 Summons Umiya Mataji Investments, Inc., #4 Summons Vipool Patel)(Konkel, Brian)
January 26, 2023 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT by Days Inns Worldwide, Inc.. Supplement to #1 Complaint, Exhibit 5 - Civil Cover Sheet Attachment. (Konkel, Brian)
January 26, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:23-cv-00235-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (aza)
January 25, 2023 Filing 2 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC., identifying Corporate Parent Wyndham Hotel Group, LLC, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Capital Research Global Investors, Other Affiliate Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. for DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.,. (Konkel, Brian)
January 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4985220.), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - SynXis Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Guaranty, #4 Exhibit D - 1.30.20 Letter Acknowledgement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Konkel, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Days Inns Worldwide, Inc., v. Umiya Mataji Investment, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.,
Represented By: Brian Konkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Days Inns Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Paul Couch
Represented By: Yvette Donaldson
Represented By: Brian Konkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMIYA MATAJI INVESTMENT, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAYANTI PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAIMINI PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIPOOL PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAYAL PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umiya Mataji Investment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?