Paddock v. Ceres Consulting LLC
Plaintiff: Charles Paddock
Defendant: Ceres Consulting LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01049
Filed: March 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2023 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ceres Consulting LLC, filed by Charles Paddock.(Jorgensen, Christian)
May 25, 2023 Filing 19 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Miller, Bobby)
May 8, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 347, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 23-cv-1049-SMY. (csb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JURISDICTIONAL ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte on the issue of federal subject matter jurisdiction. See Foster v. Hill, 497 F.3d 695, 696-97 (7th Cir. 2007) ("It is the responsibility of a court to make an independent evaluation of whether subject matter jurisdiction exists in every case."). Plaintiff brought this suit in federal court based on the complete diversity of the parties (Doc. 1). However, the allegations regarding the citizenship of Defendant Ceres Consulting, LLC are deficient. The citizenship of an LLC for diversity purposes is the citizenship of each of its members. See, e.g., Copeland v. Penske Logistics, LLC, 675 F.3d 1040, 1043 (7th Cir. 2012). Consequently, the complaint must identify each member of the LLC and their citizenship as of the date the complaint was filed, and, if those members have members, the citizenship of those members as well, until a corporation or a natural person is reached. West v. Louisville Gas & Elec. Co., 951 F.3d 827, 829 (7th Cir. 2020); Thomas v. Guardsmark, LLC, 487 F.3d 531, 534 (7th Cir. 2007). Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint by May 30, 2023, that clearly sets forth all of the information needed to determine whether the parties are completely diverse. If Plaintiff fails to do so or if, after reviewing the amended complaint, the Court finds that Plaintiff has not established complete diversity, the Court may dismiss this action for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/8/2023. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 4, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Ceres Consulting LLC to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 347, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Ceres Consulting LLC on 5/4/2023. Consent due by 5/25/2023 (csb)
April 25, 2023 Filing 15 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Ceres Consulting LLC. (Miller, Bobby)
April 25, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ceres Consulting LLC.(Miller, Bobby)
April 25, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobby R. Miller, Jr on behalf of Ceres Consulting LLC (Miller, Bobby)
April 25, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re 11 Notice (Other) filed by Charles Paddock.. Incorrect event selected. For this document, the correct event is Other Filings -Other Documents- Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (csb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 24, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE: Charles Paddock was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 347, Charles Paddock shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 5/1/2023 (csb)
April 12, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Paddock. Ceres Consulting LLC served on 4/4/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Jorgensen, Christian)
March 31, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Ceres Consulting LLC, and originals mailed to Attorney Jorgensen. (kdw)
March 31, 2023 Filing 7 EXHIBIT by Charles Paddock. Exhibit to #1 Complaint (Civil Cover Sheet). (Jorgensen, Christian)
March 31, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian J. Jorgensen on behalf of Charles Paddock (Jorgensen, Christian)
March 31, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by Charles Paddock.See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Jorgensen does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (csb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 31, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by Charles Paddock. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. (csb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 31, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Orders 257 and 341. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 257 and 341, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Charles Paddock. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 23-1049-MAB. Consent due by 4/21/2023 (csb)
March 30, 2023 Filing 2 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Charles Paddock. (Jorgensen, Christian)
March 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ceres Consulting LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-5038862.), filed by Charles Paddock. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Jorgensen, Christian) Modified on 3/30/2023 (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paddock v. Ceres Consulting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Paddock
Represented By: Christian J. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceres Consulting LLC
Represented By: Bobby R. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?