USA v. One Smith and Wesson, Model SD40VE, .40 caliber pistol, bearing serial number FYB1311 and 1 round of ammunition
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: One Smith and Wesson, Model SD40VE, .40 caliber pistol, bearing serial number FYB1311 and 1 round of ammunition
Case Number: 3:2023cv02689
Filed: August 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re 5 Order on Motion to Stay. Status report due date corrected to February 7, 2024 due to typographical error. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (csb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 8, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/7/2024. (csb)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER regarding the Motion for Stay of Civil Forfeiture (Doc. 4 ). This civil forfeiture action was filed by the United States on August 3, 2023. Now, the United States moves to stay the civil forfeiture action under 18 U.S.C. 981(g)(1), stating civil discovery in this action would adversely affect the ability of the United States to conduct a related criminal investigation. The United States requests that the stay last until the criminal investigation and criminal case are completed. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Motion for Stay of Civil Forfeiture and STAYS this action in its entirety. The United States shall file a status report in this action on or before February 7, 2024, unless events before that date warrant an earlier report to the Court. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 8/7/2023. (dsw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 8/8/2023 (csb).
August 4, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture by USA. (Hanna, Adam)
August 4, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 23-cv-2689-DWD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (csb)
August 3, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of USA (Hanna, Adam)
August 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against One Smith and Wesson, Model SD40VE,.40 caliber pistol, bearing serial number FYB1311 and 1 round of ammunition, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. One Smith and Wesson, Model SD40VE, .40 caliber pistol, bearing serial number FYB1311 and 1 round of ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Smith and Wesson, Model SD40VE, .40 caliber pistol, bearing serial number FYB1311 and 1 round of ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?