Leonard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Corey Leonard
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00291
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Defendant's brief due within 30 days after filing of plaintiff's brief. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/5/2024. (clw)
April 4, 2024 Filing 9 SUBMISSION OF TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record. filed by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript Index, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Non Disability Related Development, #6 Disability Related Development, #7 Medical Records Part 1, #8 Medical Records Part 2, #9 Medical Records Part 3, #10 Medical Records Part 4, #11 Medical Records Part 5, #12 Medical Records Part 6, #13 Medical Records Part 7, #14 Medical Records Part 8)(Wyatt, Nathan)
April 4, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C. Hugo on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Hugo, Megan)
February 21, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wyatt, Nathan)
February 21, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wyatt, Nathan)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/9/2024. (kss)
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Commencement of Action and Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. An electronic copy of the Complaint is attached. All future documents must bear case number 3:24-cv-291-NJR. This notice suffices for service under Supplemental Rule 3 as it provides a means of electronic access to the complaint to the SSAOGC and the U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of Illinois. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. (adh)
February 6, 2024 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Corey Leonard. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Corey Leonard. (Attachments: #1 Supplement ORIGINAL FILING FORM, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVERSHEET)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
February 6, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen N. Van Fossan on behalf of Corey Leonard (Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Leonard
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Megan C. Hugo
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?