Zhu et al v. Keeley & Sons, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Yafeng Zhu and Shuhui Zhang
Defendant: Keeley & Sons, Inc., a for-profit corporation, Eugene Keeley, The Kilian Corporation, a for-profit corporation, James R Kilian, Kilian Transport, Inc. a for profit corporation, Asphalt Sales & Products, Inc., Stutz Excavating, Inc. a for-profit corporation, Keller Construction, Inc., John Doe Defendants 1-10, Keeley & Sons, Inc., Kilian Corporation, Stutz Excavating, Inc., John Doe 1-10 and Kilian Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00908
Filed: March 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Asphalt Sales & Products, Inc.. (McBrearty, Brian)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Kilian Transport, Inc.. (McBrearty, Brian)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Kilian Corporation. (McBrearty, Brian)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING as MOOT #48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Keeley & Sons, Inc., filed the instant motion seeking an extension of time to file an answer or other responsive pleading (Doc. 48). As this motion is identical to the motion filed by Defendant Keeley & Sons that the Court granted yesterday (see Docs. 43, 50), the instant motion is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/16/2024. (scm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #43 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer; and GRANTING #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. In order to align the requested extensions, both Defendant Keeley & Sons, Inc., and Defendant Stutz Excavating, Inc., answers or other responsive pleadings are now due on or before June 16, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/15/2024. (scm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF ACTION re #41 and #42 Notice of Appearance filed by Keeley & Sons, Inc., #44 Notice of Appearance filed by Stutz Excavating, Inc. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms-0.(kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Keeley & Sons, Inc.. (Salsbury, Brent)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Keeley & Sons, Inc. Document contains a proposed order. Proposed orders are not to be filed, rather should be submitted via e-mail to the assigned Judge (see CM/ECF Users Manual at pgs. 2.6-2.7). The proposed order will be deleted in accordance with this Courts practices and shall be sent via email accordingly. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Keely & Sons, Inc and Stutz Excavating, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Keely & Sons, Inc and Stutz Excavating, Inc. on 5/15/2024. Consent due by 6/5/2024 (kdw)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stutz Excavating, Inc.. (Melnyk, Yaro)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Yaro M. Melnyk on behalf of Stutz Excavating, Inc. (Melnyk, Yaro)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Keeley & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Order Proposed Order)(Salsbury, Brent)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Larsen Salsbury on behalf of Keeley & Sons, Inc. (Salsbury, Brent)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Zachary Vaughn on behalf of Keeley & Sons, Inc. (Vaughn, Charles)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #36 Unopposed Motion to File Responsive Pleadings Out of Time. Defendants The Killian Corporation, Killian Transport, Inc., and Asphalt Sales and Products, Inc., filed this motion requesting an extension of time to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint and for leave to file their answers instanter. The motion is GRANTED and Defendants' Answers (Docs. 37, 38, 39) are hereby filed instanter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/14/2024. (scm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Defendant ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kilian Corporation.(McBrearty, Brian)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Defendant ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kilian Transport, Inc..(McBrearty, Brian)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Defendant ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Asphalt Sales & Products, Inc..(McBrearty, Brian)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responsive Pleadings Out of Time by Asphalt Sales & Products, Inc., Kilian Corporation, Kilian Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Order Proposed Order)(McBrearty, Brian)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF ACTION re #33 Notice of Appearance filed by Keller Construction, Inc. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (clw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Keller Construction, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Keller Construction, Inc. on 5/8/2024. Consent due by 5/29/2024 (clw)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Cerulo on behalf of Keller Construction, Inc. (Cerulo, Michael)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Keller Construction, Inc..(Cerulo, Michael)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Kilian Transport, Inc. served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. (Grieco, Michael)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Kilian Corporation served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. (Grieco, Michael)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Keller Construction, Inc. served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. (Grieco, Michael)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Keeley & Sons, Inc. served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. (Grieco, Michael)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Asphalt Sales & Products, Inc. served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. (Grieco, Michael)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Stutz Excavating, Inc. served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. (Grieco, Michael)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #19 , #20 , #21 , #21 , #22 , #23 . #24 Affidavit filed by Shuhui Zhang, Yafeng Zhu. Select the event which most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Summons Returned Executed. E-filer is instructed to re-file using Civil>Service of Process> Summons Returned Executed in order to properly trigger the answer due deadline. Filer will need to refile the documents. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STRICKEN AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs. (Grieco, Michael) Modified on 4/24/2024 (kdw).
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STRICKEN AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs. (Grieco, Michael) Modified on 4/24/2024 (kdw).
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STRICKEN AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs. (Grieco, Michael) Modified on 4/24/2024 (kdw).
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STRICKEN AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs. (Grieco, Michael) Modified on 4/24/2024 (kdw).
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STRICKEN AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs. (Grieco, Michael) Modified on 4/24/2024 (kdw).
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STRICKEN AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs. (Grieco, Michael) Modified on 4/24/2024 (kdw).
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Grieco, Michael)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE: Shuhui Zhang, Yafeng Zhu was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, Shuhui Zhang, Yafeng Zhu shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 4/25/2024 (clw)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Kilian Transport, Inc and originals mailed to Attorney Grieco. (kdw)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Requested. (Grieco, Michael)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #4 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Shuhui Zhang, Yafeng Zhu. Duplicative of Summons requested at Doc. 5.(csb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Stutz Excavating, Inc.. Originals mailed to counsel for service. (jle)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Asphalt Sales & Products, Inc., Keeley & Sons, Inc., Keller Construction, Inc. Originals mailed to counsel for service. (csb)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Kilian Corporation. Original mailed to counsel for service. (adh)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Shuhui Zhang, Yafeng Zhu. (Grieco, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Requested. (Grieco, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Requested. (Grieco, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Grieco, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Grieco, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Grieco, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STRICKEN Summons Returned Unexecuted by Shuhui Zhang, Yafeng Zhu as to Asphalt Sales & Products, Inc.. (Grieco, Michael) Modified on 3/28/2024 (csb).
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint, filed by Shuhui Zhang, Yafeng Zhu.Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx.(kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Orders 347 and 367. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Shuhui Zhang, Yafeng Zhu. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 24-908-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 4/17/2024 (kdw)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Asphalt Sales & Products, Inc., John Doe Defendants 1-10, Eugene Keeley, Keeley & Sons, Inc., a for-profit corporation, Keller Construction, Inc., James R Kilian, Kilian Transport, Inc. a for profit corporation, Stutz Excavating, Inc. a for-profit corporation, The Kilian Corporation, a for-profit corporation ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5347877.), filed by Shuhui Zhang, Yafeng Zhu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grieco, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhu et al v. Keeley & Sons, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yafeng Zhu
Represented By: Michael R. Grieco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuhui Zhang
Represented By: Michael R. Grieco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keeley & Sons, Inc., a for-profit corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Keeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kilian Corporation, a for-profit corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Kilian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilian Transport, Inc. a for profit corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asphalt Sales & Products, Inc.
Represented By: Brian K. McBrearty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stutz Excavating, Inc. a for-profit corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Cerulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keeley & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Brent Larsen Salsbury
Represented By: Charles Zachary Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilian Corporation
Represented By: Brian K. McBrearty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stutz Excavating, Inc.
Represented By: Yaro M. Melnyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilian Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Brian K. McBrearty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?