Midland States Bank v. Holden Family, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Midland States Bank
Defendant: Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC and Palladium Grid LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv01214
Filed: May 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #19 Amended Document filed by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC, Modified to State the Document is an Amended Notice of Removal. #20 Amended Document filed by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC, Modified to State the Document is an Amended Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (clw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 14, 2024 Filing 20 AMENDED Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC. Amendment to #5 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement . (Zych, James) Modified on 6/17/2024 (clw).
June 14, 2024 Filing 19 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zych, James) Modified on 6/17/2024 (clw).
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (Action due by 6/14/2024). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/6/2024. (dkb).
May 31, 2024 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint //Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Holden Family, LLC by Holden Family, LLC.(Zych, James)
May 31, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint //Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC by Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC.(Zych, James)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Defendants Holden Family, LLC and Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC's, Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants SHALL file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before Friday, May 31, 2024. (Holden Family, LLC answer due 5/31/2024; Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC answer due 5/31/2024). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/28/2024. (dkb). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 24, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC. (Zych, James)
May 24, 2024 Filing 13 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Eggmann, Robert)
May 24, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Zych on behalf of Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC (Zych, James)
May 24, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, this case will remain with the assigned Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (clw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 24, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (LaRose, Christopher)
May 14, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Palladium Grid LLC. Original sent to counsel for service. (clw)
May 14, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Requested. (LaRose, Christopher)
May 13, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce LeMoine on behalf of Midland States Bank (LeMoine, Bruce)
May 10, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. LaRose on behalf of Midland States Bank (LaRose, Christopher)
May 6, 2024 Filing 5 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC. (Eggmann, Robert)
May 6, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (clw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 3, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Midland States Bank, Holden Family, LLC and Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Midland States Bank, Holden Family, LLC and Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC on 5/3/2024. Consent due by 5/24/2024 (clw)
May 3, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 24-CV-1214-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (clw)
May 3, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, Effingham County, case number 2024LA16 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5380248), filed by Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC, Holden Family, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Eggmann, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midland States Bank v. Holden Family, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midland States Bank
Represented By: Bruce LeMoine
Represented By: Christopher R. LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holden Family, LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Eggmann, III
Represented By: James J. Zych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Eggmann, III
Represented By: James J. Zych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palladium Grid LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?