Archibald v. Capital One Financial Corporation
Plaintiff: Sade Archibald
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 3:2024cv01446
Filed: June 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2024 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 7/2/2024. (trf)
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pro se Plaintiff Sade Archibald's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is DENIED and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case on the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 7/2/2024. (trf) Modified on 7/2/2024 (trf). Modified on 7/8/2024 (trf).
July 1, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sade Archibald. Capital One Financial Corporation served on 6/18/2024, answer due 7/9/2024. (tkm)
June 28, 2024 Filing 7 (SEE DOCKET ENTRY 6 FOR DOCUMENT) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Sade Archibald. (tkm)
June 28, 2024 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Sade Archibald filed by Sade Archibald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P, #2 Exhibit O - Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(tkm)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Before the Court is #1 Complaint filed by pro se Plaintiff Sade Archibald. Due to the manifest deficiencies relating to subject matter jurisdiction in the pending #1 Complaint, Plaintiff Archibald is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than June 28, 2024 as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. If Plaintiff fails to provide an adequate basis for this Court to assert subject matter jurisdiction over this suit, the Court will dismiss this matter for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Additionally, Plaintiff Archibald is WARNED to refrain from filing patently erroneous pleadings containing clearly defective legal arguments in this District; continued conduct of this type may result in sanctions, including dismissal of this case. Show Cause Response due by 6/28/2024. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 6/7/2024. (trf)
June 5, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, this case will remain with the assigned Stephen P. McGlynn. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (tkm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 5, 2024 Filing 3 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (tkm)
June 5, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capital One Financial Corporation. Original summons given back to plaintiff over the counter, as she was at the Intake counter. (tkm)
June 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Financial Corporation, filed by Sade Archibald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tkm)
June 5, 2024 Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number 9676 (tkm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archibald v. Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sade Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?