Mowrey v. Fort Wayne City of et al
Plaintiff: Foster Mowrey
Defendant: Fort Wayne City of, C M Taylor and John Does
Case Number: 1:2012cv00121
Filed: April 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Roger B Cosbey
Presiding Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING and DENYING Defendants' objection to 77 The Court's Preliminary Jury Instruction No. 5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 12/30/2013. (lhc)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 50 MOTION in Limine by Plaintiff Foster Mowrey; GRANTING 51 MOTION in Limine regarding citizen complaints, other criminal or civil actions, or discipline against the defendant officer or any testifying officer or information contained in the officers personnel files with the Fort Wayne Police Department filed by Fort Wayne City of, C M Taylor, as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 12/12/2013. (lhc)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants John Does, Fort Wayne City of, C M Taylor. DENYING IN PART the 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claims of excessive force, unlawful entry, and false arrest against Taylor, and the state law battery claims against Taylor individually and the City under a theory of respondeat superior; but otherwise GRANTING all other claims. Counsel to file Pretrial order by 10/24/2013. This matter set for Pretrial Conference on 10/31/2013 2:45 PM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 10/17/2013. (lhc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mowrey v. Fort Wayne City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Wayne City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C M Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foster Mowrey
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Ilene M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?