Townsend v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Townsend
Defendant: M Wilson, Officer Rivera, R Page, Officer Juricak and John/Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2013cv00315
Filed: October 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Roger B Cosbey
Presiding Judge: Rudy Lozano
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion for summary judgment 36 and DIRECTS the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/10/2015. (lhc)(cc: Pla)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING 45 MOTION Requesting Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Eddie Townsend. The pending motion for summary judgment 36 remains under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 1/5/2015. (lhc)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 25 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff Eddie Townsend. Clerk DIRECTED to show Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed except that Plaintiff's claims against the Fort Wayne Police Department are STRICKEN. Plaintiff DIRECTED to effect service of process on the City of Fort Wayne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 3/11/14. (cer)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff Eddie Townsend. Clerk DIRECTED to show the Amended Complaint filed except that Plaintiff's state law tort claims against the individual Defendant offi cers are STRICKEN without prejudice. Since Plaintiff's claims against John/Jane Doe, an employee of the Allen County Prosecuting Attorney, have been dropped from the Amended Complaint the 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DEEMED MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 1/27/14. (cer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Wilson
Represented By: Robert T Keen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Rivera
Represented By: Robert T Keen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Page
Represented By: Robert T Keen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Juricak
Represented By: Robert T Keen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Represented By: Robert T Keen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?