CCT Enterprises LLC v. Kriss USA Inc
Plaintiff: |
CCT Enterprises LLC |
Defendant: |
Kriss USA Inc |
Counter_claimant: |
Kriss USA Inc |
Counter_defendant: |
CCT Enterprises LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00249 |
Filed: |
August 15, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Fort Wayne Office |
County: |
De Kalb |
Presiding Judge: |
Roger B Cosbey |
Presiding Judge: |
Jon E DeGuilio |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 27, 2016 |
Filing
56
OPINION AND ORDER re 50 NOTICE of Anticipated Costs for Additional Discovery by Kriss USA Inc; 51 AFFIDAVIT of Eileen S. Pruitt in Support of Attorneys' Fees by Kriss USA Inc. Kriss USA Inc is AWARDED attorneys' fees in the amount of 036;8,528.80 for its Motion to Exclude. The Court also PRELIMINARILY APPROVES the estimated fees and costs submitted by Kriss USA Inc for its follow-up discovery. Unless CCT Enterprises LLC files a Notice by 5/4/2016 stating that it is withdrawing th e Modified PO, the Court will re-open discovery for a period of 90 days for the limited purpose of permitting Kriss USA Inc to conduct follow-up discovery relative to that document, and will require CCT Enterprises LLC to reimburse Kriss USA Inc for the reasonable expenses incurred through that discovery. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/27/16. (cer)
|
March 31, 2016 |
Filing
49
OPINION AND ORDER: Kriss motion to exclude 41 is GRANTED in part, in that the Court will reopen discovery for the limited purpose of allowing Kriss to conduct reasonable follow-up discovery into the Modified PO, and will require CCT to reimburse K riss for the reasonable expenses it incurs in conducting that discovery. Kriss is ORDERED to file a notice, by April 11, 2016, itemizing the reasonable expenses it expects to incur through that discovery. CCT may file any response by April 18, 2016. The Court will then approve the reasonable expenses and reopen discovery for this limited purpose unless CCT chooses to withdraw the document. Kriss is also ORDERED to submit an accounting of the reasonable attorneys fees it incurred in bringing thismotion, by April 11, 2016, with any response by CCT due April 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 3/31/2016. (rmn)
|
February 3, 2015 |
Filing
25
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 24 STIPULATION for Agreed Protective Order by Defendant Kriss USA Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/3/15. (cer)
|
January 26, 2015 |
Filing
22
OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING 21 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendant Kriss USA Inc. Parties may submit a motion with a revised protective order as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/26/2015. (lhc)
|
August 15, 2014 |
Filing
10
OPINION AND ORDER re 1 Notice of Removal. Defendant is ORDERED to supplement the record on or before 8/29/2014, by filing an Amended Notice of Removal properly alleging the identity and citizenship of each member of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 8/15/2014. (lhc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?