Global Archery Products, Inc. v. Firgaira
Plaintiff: Global Archery Products, Inc.
Defendant: Chris Firgaira, Ashleigh Renee Firgaira, Archery Sports, Archery Attack, SEG Holdings Pty Ltd and Archery Attack Pty Ltd
Case Number: 1:2016cv00019
Filed: January 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: De Kalb
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Defendant's Motion to Reconsider 70 the Court's July 21, 2017, Opinion and Order 52 and DISMISSES this case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/13/2018. (lhc)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint filed by Archery Attack, Ashleigh Renee Firgaira, Archery Sports. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 7/21/2017. (lns)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 34 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Defendants Archery Attack, Archery Sports, Ashleigh Renee Firgaira. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 3/22/17. (cer)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a second amended complaint on or before 2/10/2016, that adequately identifies the named defendants and alleges each defendant's citizenship, identifying its organizational form and the citizenship of its owners. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/27/2016. (lhc)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to supplement the record on or before 2/2/2016, by filing an amended complaint that adequately alleges the citizenship of Defendant and the amount in controversy between the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/19/2016. (lhc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Archery Products, Inc. v. Firgaira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Archery Products, Inc.
Represented By: Dean E McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Firgaira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashleigh Renee Firgaira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archery Sports
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archery Attack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEG Holdings Pty Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archery Attack Pty Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?