Design Basics, LLC v. Culver Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Design Basics, LLC
Defendant: Culver Construction, Inc, Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation, New Paris Development Company, LLC, Wes Culver Realty, LLC, Culver Construction, Inc. doing business as Culver Remodeling doing business as Culver Design Build doing business as Culver Custom Homes doing business as Hallmark Homes of Michiana, Culver Development Corporation doing business as Property Management Services and Wes Culver Realty, LLC doing business as KW Commercial and Industrial doing business as Wes Culver Auctions doing business as Wes Culver Home Team
Case Number: 1:2016cv00049
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
2 Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Opinion and Order, the Defendants' #32 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/8/17. (jss)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen no longer assigned to case. The period for consent to a magistrate judges jurisdiction for all cases listed is reopened through 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/17. (nal)
December 7, 2016 Filing 41 HEARING re #34 Dft's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Determination of Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings held on 12/7/2016 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by attys Sean Quinn and Paul Harold. Dfts appeared by attys Steven Olsen and Jeremy Gayed. Arguments heard. Per the Parties' agreement, Dft Culver Construction, Inc. will produce the plan for the one home built within the 3 year look back from the date of filing of the Complaint, 2/3/2013 to present, and that all other discovery is stayed pending ruling on the #32 Dfts' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
November 28, 2016 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation, New Paris Development Company, LLC, Wes Culver Realty, LLC. (Olsen, Steven)
November 22, 2016 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation, New Paris Development Company, LLC, Wes Culver Realty, LLC. (Olsen, Steven)
November 21, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on #34 Motion to Stay Discovery is set for 12/7/2016 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr)
November 17, 2016 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re #32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Design Basics, LLC. (Quinn, Sean)
November 15, 2016 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #34 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Design Basics, LLC. (Quinn, Sean)
October 31, 2016 Filing 35 BRIEF in Support of #34 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Wes Culver Realty, LLC, Culver Development Corporation, Culver Construction, Inc., New Paris Development Company, LLC. (Olsen, Steven)
October 31, 2016 Filing 34 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation, New Paris Development Company, LLC, Wes Culver Realty, LLC. (Olsen, Steven)
October 31, 2016 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support of #32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation, New Paris Development Company, LLC, Wes Culver Realty, LLC. (Olsen, Steven)
October 31, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation, New Paris Development Company, LLC, Wes Culver Realty, LLC. (Olsen, Steven)
August 29, 2016 Filing 31 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/29/2016 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by attys Paul Harold and Sean Quinn. Dfts appeared by attys Jeremy Gayed, Jerod Adler and Michael DeBoni. The #30 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved as amended (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. Maximum of 30 interrogatories and requests for admission by each party. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 8/30/2017. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. ADR at discretion of Parties. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 10/5/2016. Pla expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the Dft by 6/5/2017. Dft expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the Pla by 7/17/2017. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/19/2016. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
August 23, 2016 Filing 30 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Quinn, Sean)
August 8, 2016 Filing 29 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr)
August 8, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2016 at 2:00 PM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr)
July 19, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edgar Harold on behalf of Design Basics, LLC (Harold, Paul)
July 19, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark F Criniti on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Criniti, Mark)
May 27, 2016 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by New Paris Development Company, LLC.(Olsen, Steven)
May 27, 2016 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Wes Culver Realty, LLC.(Olsen, Steven)
May 27, 2016 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Culver Development Corporation.(Olsen, Steven)
May 27, 2016 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Culver Construction, Inc..(Olsen, Steven)
May 12, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F DeBoni on behalf of Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation, New Paris Development Company, LLC, Wes Culver Realty, LLC (DeBoni, Michael)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137 and Local Rule 40-1(f), the Clerk of this Court is hereby directed to randomly re-assign this matter to another Article III Judge for all further proceedings. Case reassigned to Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen for all further proceedings. Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 4/15/2016. (lhc)
April 14, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerod Alan Adler on behalf of Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation (Adler, Jerod)
April 14, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by William A Ramsey on behalf of Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation (Ramsey, William)
April 14, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy N Gayed on behalf of Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation (Gayed, Jeremy)
March 21, 2016 Filing 16 ENTRY for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #13 Motion to Strike is granted and the #12 Joint Motion for Extension of Time is withdrawn. So Ordered.(mr)
March 17, 2016 Filing 15 ENTRY for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #14 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Dfts granted to and including 5/27/2016 to file an Answer to Pla's #1 Complaint. So Ordered.(mr)
March 16, 2016 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response to Plaintiffs Complaint by Defendants Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation, New Paris Development Company, LLC, Wes Culver Realty, LLC. (Olsen, Steven)
March 16, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike Parties' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 12) re #12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other responsive pleading by Defendants Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation, New Paris Development Company, LLC, Wes Culver Realty, LLC. (Olsen, Steven)
March 16, 2016 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other responsive pleading by Defendants Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation, New Paris Development Company, LLC, Wes Culver Realty, LLC. (Olsen, Steven)
March 16, 2016 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Culver Development Corporation. (Olsen, Steven)
March 16, 2016 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Culver Construction, Inc.. (Olsen, Steven)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge Theresa L Springmann for all further proceedings. Judge Jon E DeGuilio no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 2/26/2016. (tc)
February 22, 2016 Set Answer Deadline per #8 . Answer ddl set for 3/28/2016 (kds)
February 22, 2016 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation, New Paris Development Company, LLC, Wes Culver Realty, LLC ; answer due by 03-28-2016. (Olsen, Steven)
February 22, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven John Olsen on behalf of All Defendants (Olsen, Steven)
February 12, 2016 Filing 6 REPORT by Design Basics, LLC ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT (FORM AO121). (Quinn, Sean)
February 4, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Design Basics, LLC (LaDue, John)
February 3, 2016 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Culver Construction, Inc., Culver Development Corporation, New Paris Development Company, LLC, Wes Culver Realty, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
February 3, 2016 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Design Basics, LLC. (Quinn, Sean)
February 3, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Joseph Quinn on behalf of Design Basics, LLC (Quinn, Sean)
February 3, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-2861440.), filed by Design Basics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Quinn, Sean)
February 3, 2016 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE (kjp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Basics, LLC v. Culver Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culver Construction, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culver Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy N Gayed
Represented By: Michael F DeBoni
Represented By: Steven John Olsen
Represented By: Jerod A Adler
Represented By: William A Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culver Development Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy N Gayed
Represented By: Michael F DeBoni
Represented By: Steven John Olsen
Represented By: Jerod A Adler
Represented By: William A Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Paris Development Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael F DeBoni
Represented By: Steven John Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Culver Realty, LLC
Represented By: Michael F DeBoni
Represented By: Steven John Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culver Construction, Inc. doing business as Culver Remodeling doing business as Culver Design Build doing business as Culver Custom Homes doing business as Hallmark Homes of Michiana
Represented By: Jeremy N Gayed
Represented By: Michael F DeBoni
Represented By: Steven John Olsen
Represented By: Jerod A Adler
Represented By: William A Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culver Development Corporation doing business as Property Management Services
Represented By: Jeremy N Gayed
Represented By: Michael F DeBoni
Represented By: Steven John Olsen
Represented By: Jerod A Adler
Represented By: William A Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Culver Realty, LLC doing business as KW Commercial and Industrial doing business as Wes Culver Auctions doing business as Wes Culver Home Team
Represented By: Michael F DeBoni
Represented By: Steven John Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Basics, LLC
Represented By: Paul Edgar Harold
Represented By: Mark F Criniti
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Sean J Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?