Rolan et al v. Atlantic Richfield Company et al
Plaintiff: LeRithea Rolan and Lamottca Brooks
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00357
Filed: October 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS 156 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants' E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 12/16/2019. (lhc)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 OPINION AND ORDER: The motion to grant class certification for the negligence claim against DuPont 129 is DENIED without the need for an evidentiary hearing. The Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge Susan Collins to set case related deadlines, including discovery, which is no longer bifurcated. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 11/5/2019. (shk)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 10/22/19. (kjp)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING 114 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs and by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. The parties may submit a revised stipulated protective order consistent with the requirements of Rule 26(c), this Opinion and Order, and Seventh Circuit case law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 5/3/2018. (lhc)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Dft Atlantic Richfield Company's Motion to Dismiss 39 , GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Defendants E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, and the Chemours Company's Amended Mo tion to Dismiss 45 , TERMS the Dfts' Motions for Judicial Notice 41 , 44 , and DENIES the Plas' Motion to Certify Class 4 with LEAVE TO REFILE based upon the claims remaining after this Order. Specifically, the Court: (1) DENIES the Dfts' Motions to Dismiss as to the Plas' CERCLA Section 107(a) Claim for Cost Recovery; (2) GRANTS Dft Atlantic Richfield Company's Motion to Dismiss as to the Plas' nuisance and negligence claims against it; (3) GRANTS Dfts E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, and the Chemours Company's Amended Motion to Dismiss as to the Plas' nuisance claim against them; and (4) DENIES Dfts E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, and the Chemours Company's Amended Motion to Dismiss as to the Plas' negligence claim against them. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 7/26/2017. (lhc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rolan et al v. Atlantic Richfield Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeRithea Rolan
Represented By: James D Brusslan
Represented By: Sharon A Harris
Represented By: Jason B Hirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamottca Brooks
Represented By: James D Brusslan
Represented By: Sharon A Harris
Represented By: Jason B Hirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Represented By: Kathleen A DeLaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?