Stewart v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Tyquan Stewart
Defendant: Jackson, Employee and Allen County Jail
Case Number: 1:2017cv00273
Filed: June 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Paul R Cherry
Presiding Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 148 MOTION in Limine Other Lawsuits and Lay Medical Testimony by Defendants Allen County Sheriff's Department, Dr Dennis, Officer Jackson, Chaplain Seivers, as outlined in Order. This case will be set for a telephonic status conference by separate entry. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 4/28/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Rene Jennings, T McCullough. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants McCullough and Jennings and against Plaintiff Stewart bey. Plai ntiff's claims against the remaining Defendants are unaffected by this order and remain pending. Plaintiff's motion for stay 115 is DENIED AS MOOT in part and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT in part. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 12/20/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (lhc) Modified on 12/20/2019 cert 7000 0600 0028 2819 7231 (lhc).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 OPINION AND ORDER denying 70 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 12/21/18. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OPINION AND ORDER: Court hereby DENIES the relief requested in the "Reconsideration for Counsel" DE 52 and REAFFIRMS its 1/3/18 and 4/24/18 rulings that, given the level of difficulty of the case and despite his mental illness, Plainti ff is competent to represent himself in this case. The Court DENIES the request to have the Court in this case decide whether counsel should be appointed for Plaintiff in the other cases, as the considerations for appointment of counsel may be unique to each case. Plaintiff must file a motion for appointment of counsel in each case, if he so wishes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 9/21/18. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 22 MOTION for Request for Removal of Judge filed by Tyquan Stewart. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 4/23/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lns)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING re Letter DE 6 , Letter DE 12 and 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff is free to continue to attempt to retain counsel on his own. In addition, no certificate of service was filed with any of Plaintiffs filin gs. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d) requires that a certificate of service must be filed along with all papers filed with the court after the complaint, with the exception of certain discovery-related documents. Any future filings that do not contain a certificate of service may be stricken without further warning. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 01/03/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sct)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING Complaint against Dfts Allen County Jail and Employee; GRANTING 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tyquan Stewart; WAIVING the filing fee; and DIRECTING the USMS to effect service of process on Dft. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 9/13/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party and USM)(lns)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyquan Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?