Jones v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Joy Jones
Defendant: Wells_Fargo Bank NA and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv00125
Filed: May 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION AND ORDER The Court DENIES the Plaintiff's Motions 16 and 17 for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 12/3/18. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(kjp)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES 14 as the Plaintiff's Complaint was dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and no basis exists to reopen her case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 9/25/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER: The Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint (ECF 11) is MOOT, the Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF 6) is DENIED, and the case is DISMISSED for LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 9/25/18. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells_Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?