Cole v. Gladieux
Plaintiff: Richard L Cole and Richard Cole
Defendant: David Gladieux and Sheriff David Gladieux
Undetermined: C Erik Chickedantz
Case Number: 1:2018cv00313
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/8/2018 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared with atty Ilene Smith. Dft appeared by atty Lindsey Swanson and Captain Steve Stone. The #11 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 5/27/2019. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Erik Chickedantz appointed as Mediator. Atty Smith to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Swanson. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/29/2018. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #14 Joint Motion to Attend Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Telephone is denied. The in-person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 10:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 11/8/2018 at 10:30 am in US District Court - Fort Wayne. Text entry order. (mr)
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Attend Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Telephone by Defendant Sheriff David Gladieux. (Feighner, J)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF ATTORNEY. (Feighner, J)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Creigh Swanson on behalf of Sheriff David Gladieux (Swanson, Lindsey)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Smith, Ilene)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff and Defendant to attend in person.(mr)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John O Feighner on behalf of Sheriff David Gladieux (Feighner, John)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sheriff David Gladieux. Sheriff David Gladieux waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Feighner, J)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by J Spencer Feighner on behalf of All Defendants (Feighner, J)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Sheriff David Gladieux. Waiver of Service due by 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (cc: Dft)(lns)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pla Richard Cole and DEFERRING payment of the filing fee. Pla to pay $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery that is received in this case. Clerk and the USMS DIRECTED to effect service of process on Dft. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 9/27/2018. (lns)
September 27, 2018 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (IFP Motion Pending) (sct)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C Myers on behalf of Richard L Cole (Myers, Christopher)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Richard L Cole. (Smith, Ilene)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against David Gladieux, filed by Richard L Cole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Tort Notice), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Smith, Ilene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Gladieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L Cole
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Ilene M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cole
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Ilene M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gladieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff David Gladieux
Represented By: Lindsey Creigh Swanson
Represented By: John O Feighner
Represented By: J Spencer Feighner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: C Erik Chickedantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?