Gray v. Quikcut, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joy L. Gray and Joy L Gray
Defendant: Quikcut, Inc. and Quikcut Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv00361
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Quikcut Inc.(Stites, Anthony)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 10:15 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel to appear in person.(mr)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Taliesin P Anglin on behalf of Quikcut Inc (Anglin, Taliesin)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M Stites on behalf of Quikcut Inc (Stites, Anthony)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joy L Gray. Quikcut Inc served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Myers, Christopher)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Quikcut Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lhc)
November 9, 2018 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE* (lhc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Quikcut, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3728610.), filed by Joy L. Gray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (COD), #2 Exhibit B (NORTS), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Myers, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Quikcut, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy L. Gray
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy L Gray
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quikcut, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quikcut Inc
Represented By: Anthony M Stites
Represented By: Taliesin P Anglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?