Cordell v Auto Zone, Inc.
Plaintiff: DAVID CORDELL and STACIE CORDELL
Defendant: AUTOZONE STORES, LLC, AutoZone Stores LLC and Auto Zone, Inc.
Undetermined: Kevin Fitzharris
Case Number: 1:2018cv00385
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 20 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by AutoZone Stores LLC.(Mundrick, Keith)
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against AutoZone Stores, LLC, filed by David Cordell and Stacie Cordell.(mr) Modified on 1/2/2019 to correct name of Dft (mr).
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/2/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plas appeared with attys Joshua Friend and John Feighner. Atty Keith Mundrick appeared in person, and Barbara Barnes, Claims Adjuster, appeared telephonically on behalf of Dft. Court grants Plas' #14 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, and deems the Amended Complaint filed. The #15 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motion deadlines and trial dates) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 8/23/2019. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Kevin Fitzharris appointed as Mediator. Atty Friend to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Mundrick. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 1/23/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
December 31, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Defendant's Attorney Certification. (Mundrick, Keith)
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Auto Zone, Inc..(Mundrick, Keith)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Friend, Joshua)
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs David Cordell, Stacie Cordell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand)(Friend, Joshua)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE Attorney Certificate. (Friend, Joshua)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING without prejudice #11 Motion to Substitute Party. Plaintiffs are AFFORDED to 1/7/2019 to file a motion requesting leave of Court to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 12/17/18. (ksp)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by Plaintiffs David Cordell, Stacie Cordell. (Feighner, John)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John O Feighner on behalf of David Cordell, Stacie Cordell (Feighner, John)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiffs and Defendant representative to attend.(mr)
November 26, 2018 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
November 26, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Auto Zone, Inc. answer due 12/26/2018 per DE #6. (ksp)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by AUTOZONE STORES, LLC ; answer due by 12/26/2018. (Mundrick, Keith)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTOZONE STORES, LLC. (Mundrick, Keith)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by AUTOZONE STORES, LLC TO PLAINTIFFS OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Mundrick, Keith)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith D Mundrick on behalf of AUTOZONE STORES, LLC (Mundrick, Keith)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James P Strenski on behalf of AUTOZONE STORES, LLC (Strenski, James)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3740199.) from Allen County Superior Court 2, Cause No. 02D02-1810-CT-000607, filed by AUTOZONE STORES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's initiating pleadings, #2 Exhibit B-AutoZone's pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strenski, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordell v Auto Zone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID CORDELL
Represented By: Joshua C Friend
Represented By: John O Feighner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACIE CORDELL
Represented By: Joshua C Friend
Represented By: John O Feighner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTOZONE STORES, LLC
Represented By: Keith D Mundrick
Represented By: James P Strenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Stores LLC
Represented By: Keith D Mundrick
Represented By: James P Strenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Zone, Inc.
Represented By: James P Strenski
Represented By: Keith D Mundrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Kevin Fitzharris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?