Nairamat Investments, LLC v. Wise et al

Plaintiff: Nairamat Investments, LLC
Defendant: Berekk A. Blackwell, Scotty's Holdings, LLC, PRP Scotty's Holdings, LLC and Scott M. Wise
Case Number: 1:2018cv00391
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Berekk A. Blackwell. (Drummy, John)
January 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, (Unopposed) by Defendant Scott M. Wise. (Fulk, Jason)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Further Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement by Plaintiff Nairamat Investments, LLC. Plaintiff is AFFORDED to and including 1/30/2019, to file a second supplemental jurisdictional statement in an effort to establish diversity jurisdiction. Plaintiff's motion to conduct limited jurisdictional discovery #12 is also GRANTED. This case is automatically STAYED with respect to Holdings pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/8/2019. (lhc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Douglas Small on behalf of Berekk A. Blackwell (Small, Todd)
January 2, 2019 Filing 17 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Berekk A. Blackwell ; answer due by January 24, 2019. (Drummy, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John B Drummy on behalf of Berekk A. Blackwell (Drummy, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to PRP Scotty's Holdings, LLC, Berekk A. Blackwell. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (cc: Pla's counsel) (lns)
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 Proposed Summons filed by Nairamat Investments, LLC. (Skekloff, Scot)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 Proposed Summons filed by Nairamat Investments, LLC. (Skekloff, Scot)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Discovery (Plaintiff's Motion for Authorization to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery) by Plaintiff Nairamat Investments, LLC. (Skekloff, Scot)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Further Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement by Plaintiff Nairamat Investments, LLC. (Skekloff, Scot)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 STATEMENT (Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement) re #9 Order, Set Deadlines filed by Nairamat Investments, LLC. (Skekloff, Scot)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff is AFFORDED to and including 12/27/2018, to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement in an effort to establish diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 12/11/2018. (lhc)
December 10, 2018 Set Deadlines: Dft Scott M. Wise's answer due 1/24/2019 pursuant to #8 Notice. (lns)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Scott M. Wise ; answer due by January 24, 2019. (Fulk, Jason)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Riley H Floyd on behalf of Scott M. Wise (Floyd, Riley)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Hull on behalf of Scott M. Wise (Hull, Andrew)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason L Fulk on behalf of Scott M. Wise (Fulk, Jason)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Berekk A. Blackwell, PRP Scotty's Holdings, LLC, Scotty's Holdings, LLC, Scott M. Wise. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
November 29, 2018 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (sct)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey B Harding on behalf of Nairamat Investments, LLC (Harding, Jeffrey)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Scot T Skekloff on behalf of Nairamat Investments, LLC (Skekloff, Scot)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Berekk A. Blackwell, PRP Scotty's Holdings, LLC, Scotty's Holdings, LLC, Scott M. Wise( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3744169.), filed by Nairamat Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons SUMMONS - SCOTT WISE, #10 Proposed Summons SUMMONS - SCOTTY'S HOLDINGS, LLC, #11 Proposed Summons SUMMONS - SCOTTY'S HOLDINGS, LLC, #12 Proposed Summons SUMMONS - PRP SCOTTY'S HOLDINGS, LLC, #13 Proposed Summons SUMMONS - PRP SCOTTY'S HOLDINGS, LLC, #14 Proposed Summons SUMMONS - BEREKK BLACKWELL)(Skekloff, Scot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nairamat Investments, LLC v. Wise et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berekk A. Blackwell
Represented By: Todd D Small
Represented By: John B Drummy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotty's Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRP Scotty's Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott M. Wise
Represented By: Riley H Floyd
Represented By: Andrew W Hull
Represented By: Jason L Fulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nairamat Investments, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey B Harding
Represented By: Scot T Skekloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?