Robinson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shirley A. Robinson and Shirley A Robinson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Undetermined: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2018cv00429
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill S Reeder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Reeder, Jill)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USM) (sct)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis (DE #2 ). WAIVES payment of the filing fee. DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 02/01/2019. (cc: USM) (sct)
December 28, 2018 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen added. (New Case) (IFP Motion Pending) (sct)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 3 copies of summons forms and 3 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Shirley A. Robinson. (Shull, Joseph)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Shirley A. Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 USM-285)(Shull, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley A. Robinson
Represented By: Joseph W Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley A Robinson
Represented By: Joseph W Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jill S Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?